Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45]* 11/14/1991
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 11/20/1991
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 11/20/1991
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 11/20/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 11/20/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/20/1991
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 11/20/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 11/20/1991
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 11/20/1991
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 11/20/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 11/20/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/20/1991
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 11/20/1991
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 11/20/1991
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 11/20/1991
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 11/20/1991
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/20/1991
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 11/20/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 11/20/1991
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 11/20/1991
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/21/1991
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 11/21/1991
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 11/21/1991
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/21/1991
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/21/1991
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 11/21/1991
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 11/21/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 11/21/1991
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 11/23/1991
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 11/23/1991
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 11/23/1991
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/23/1991
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 11/23/1991
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/23/1991
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 11/23/1991
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-2] 11/23/1991
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 11/23/1991
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 11/23/1991
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 11/23/1991
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 11/23/1991
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/23/1991
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 11/23/1991
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 11/23/1991
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 11/23/1991
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 11/23/1991
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 11/23/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 11/23/1991
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 11/23/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 11/23/1991
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/23/1991
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21] 11/23/1991
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 11/23/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 11/23/1991
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 11/23/1991
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/25/1991
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 11/25/1991
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 11/25/1991