There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote peace and reconciliation in El Salvador.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/14/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
11/20/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
11/20/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
11/20/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
11/14/1991Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (103)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 11/14/1991
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/14/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 11/26/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 11/26/1991
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/26/1991
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/26/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 11/26/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 11/26/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/26/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 11/26/1991
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 11/26/1991
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 11/26/1991
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 11/26/1991
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/26/1991
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 11/26/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 11/26/1991
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 11/26/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/26/1991
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 11/26/1991
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 11/26/1991
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 11/26/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 11/26/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 11/26/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/26/1991
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 11/26/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/26/1991
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 11/26/1991
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/26/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/26/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 11/26/1991
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 11/26/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 11/26/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 11/26/1991
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/26/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 11/26/1991
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 11/26/1991
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/26/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/26/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 11/26/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 11/26/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 01/28/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 01/28/1992
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 01/28/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 01/28/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/28/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 01/28/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 01/28/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 02/04/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 02/04/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 02/04/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 02/04/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 02/04/1992
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3] 02/26/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/26/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 02/26/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/26/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 02/26/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 02/26/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 02/26/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/26/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/04/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 04/09/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs11/14/1991 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science11/20/1991 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations11/20/1991 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere Affairs11/20/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3782.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3782. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/14/1991)

Sets forth U.S. policy on assistance to El Salvador.

Permits funds made available for military assistance for El Salvador for FY 1992 in excess of $21,000,000 to be obligated only with the prior notification of specified congressional committees. Authorizes the transfer of such funds to the Demobilization and Transition Fund for El Salvador established under the Foreign Operations, Export Financing, and Related Programs Appropriations Act, 1991. Makes such funds available only for costs of the demobilization, retraining, relocation, and reemployment in civilian pursuits of former combatants in the conflict in El Salvador. Permits the obligation of amounts in the Fund only if the President, prior to obligation of funds, notifies: (1) specified congressional committees; and (2) the Congress that the El Salvadoran Government and representatives of the Farabundo Marti National Liberation Front (FMLN) have reached a permanent settlement of the conflict.

Prohibits any U.S. assistance to El Salvador if the head of the El Salvadoran Government is deposed by military coup or decree. Resumes such assistance only pursuant to a law enacted by the Congress. Permits the delivery of military assistance to the armed forces of El Salvador only with the prior approval of the elected president of El Salvador.