There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to exclude from gross income the qualified military benefits received by retired military personnel serving as administrators or instructors in the Junior Reserve Officers Training Corps.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
11/18/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
11/18/1991Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/18/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 01/28/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 01/28/1992
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 01/28/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 02/04/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 02/04/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 02/04/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/04/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/04/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 02/04/1992
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 02/04/1992
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 02/04/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 02/26/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/26/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 02/26/1992
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 02/26/1992
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 03/11/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 03/11/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/11/1992
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/11/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 03/11/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/11/1992
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/18/1992
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/01/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 04/01/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/01/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 04/07/1992
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 04/29/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 05/14/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/14/1992
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 06/17/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 06/17/1992
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/21/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 10/02/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means11/18/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3801.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3801. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/18/1991)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to exclude from gross income the qualified military benefits of retired military personnel employed as administrators or instructors in the Junior Reserve Officers' Training Corps.