Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 11/19/1991
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26]* 11/19/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/19/1991
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 11/19/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 11/19/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 11/26/1991
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 11/26/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 11/26/1991
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 11/26/1991
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 11/26/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 11/26/1991
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 11/26/1991
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 11/26/1991
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 11/26/1991
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/26/1991
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/28/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 01/28/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 01/28/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 01/28/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 02/26/1992
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/26/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 03/31/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/31/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 03/31/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/31/1992
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/31/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 08/05/1992
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 08/05/1992
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 08/05/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 08/05/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/05/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 08/05/1992
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 09/17/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/17/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 09/17/1992