There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Consumer Products Safe Testing Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for nonanimal acute toxicity testing by the Federal Government.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/25/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/14/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
11/25/1991Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/25/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (99)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 11/25/1991
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 11/25/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 11/25/1991
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 01/03/1992
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 01/03/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 01/03/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 01/03/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 01/03/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 01/03/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/03/1992
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 01/03/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 01/03/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 01/03/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/03/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/03/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 01/03/1992
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 01/03/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 01/03/1992
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 02/03/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/03/1992
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/03/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/03/1992
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/03/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 03/03/1992
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 03/03/1992
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 03/03/1992
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/24/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 03/24/1992
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 04/07/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/07/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/07/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/04/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 05/04/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/04/1992
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 07/24/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/24/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/24/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/24/1992
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 07/24/1992
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/31/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 07/31/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 07/31/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 07/31/1992
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 07/31/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 08/11/1992
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 08/11/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 08/11/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 09/29/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 09/29/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/29/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 09/29/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce11/25/1991 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment01/14/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3918.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3918. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/25/1991)

Consumer Products Safe Testing Act - Declares the policy that Federal departments and agencies shall encourage the development and use of product testing procedures that accurately reflect the acute health effects on humans of certain products, including consumer products and products containing hazardous or toxic substances, but which do not rely upon animals.

Directs each Federal department or agency head (head), within one year, to: (1) review and evaluate any regulation, guideline, or recommendation issued by such department or agency which requires, recommends, or encourages the use of the Draize or other animal acute toxicity test for the purpose of evaluation of the safety of a regulated product; (2) review and evaluate nonanimal alternatives with the potential for partial or full replacement of the products regulated; and (3) promulgate regulations, guidelines, or recommendations that specify that a nonanimal acute toxicity test or battery of tests (NATT) should be used instead of an animal acute toxicity test unless that head determines that the NATT is less likely to predict the acute health effects on humans of a product than the animal acute toxicity test.

Requires the appropriate head, if a determination is made that no NATT is as likely to predict the human reaction to the regulated product as the Draize or other animal acute toxicity test, to publish in the Federal Register an explanation of all options considered and the justification for continuing the animal acute toxicity test, which shall be subject to public comment.

Provides for periodic review of animal acute toxicity testing regulations.

Makes this Act inapplicable to regulations, guidelines, or recommendations related to medical research.