There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Popular Titles

Employment Discrimination Damages (Equal Remedies Act) bill (Identified by CRS)
Equal Remedies Act (Employment Discrimination Damages) bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Equal Remedies Act of 1991

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend section 1977A of the Revised Statutes to equalize the remedies available to all victims of intentional employment discrimination, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/26/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
12/10/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
11/26/1991Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/26/1991Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/26/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (117)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 11/26/1991
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 11/26/1991
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 11/26/1991
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 11/27/1991
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 11/27/1991
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 01/28/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 01/28/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 01/28/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/28/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 01/28/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 01/28/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 01/28/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 01/28/1992
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/28/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 01/28/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 01/29/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 01/29/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 01/29/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 01/29/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/29/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/04/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 02/04/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/04/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 02/04/1992
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29] 02/04/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/05/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/05/1992
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 02/05/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 02/05/1992
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/27/1992
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 02/27/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 02/27/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/27/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/04/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/04/1992
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 03/04/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 03/04/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 03/04/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 03/24/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/24/1992
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 03/24/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/24/1992
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 03/24/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/24/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 03/24/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/24/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/24/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/24/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/09/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/09/1992
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/09/1992
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 04/09/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 06/05/1992
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/05/1992
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 06/05/1992
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 06/05/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 06/05/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/05/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 06/05/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 07/28/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/28/1992
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/28/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 09/25/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor11/26/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary11/26/1991 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights12/10/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3975. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/26/1991)

Equal Remedies Act of 1991 - Amends Federal law relating to damages in cases of intentional employment discrimination to remove provisions limiting the dollar amount of damages awarded for pecuniary and nonpecuniary losses and punitive damages.