There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Trade Act of 1974 to require the National Trade Estimate to include information regarding the impact of Arab boycotts on certain United States businesses.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/26/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/27/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
11/26/1991Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/26/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 11/26/1991
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 01/28/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 01/28/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 01/28/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 01/28/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/28/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 01/28/1992
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 01/28/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 01/28/1992
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/28/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 01/28/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/28/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 01/28/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 01/28/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 01/28/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/28/1992
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 01/28/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 01/28/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 02/04/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/04/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/04/1992
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 02/04/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 02/04/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 02/04/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 02/19/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 02/19/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 02/19/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 02/19/1992
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 02/19/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 02/25/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 02/25/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 02/25/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 02/25/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 02/25/1992
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 02/25/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 02/25/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 02/25/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 02/25/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/25/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 02/25/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 02/25/1992
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 02/27/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 02/27/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/27/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 03/11/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/11/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/20/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/20/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 03/20/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/05/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/07/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/07/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/07/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/07/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/12/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/02/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/02/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 06/02/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 06/23/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means11/26/1991 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade11/27/1991 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4002. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/26/1991)

Amends the Trade Act of 1974 to require the United States Trade Representative to include in the National Trade Estimate information with respect to the Arab boycott of U.S. persons who do business with or invest in Israel, or who do business with a person who does business with or invests there.