There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Endangered Species Act Amendments of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize and amend the Endangered Species Act in order to strengthen programs for the conservation of threatened and endangered species, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/26/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
12/09/1991Executive Comment Requested from USDA, Commerce, Interior.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
12/09/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
11/26/1991Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/26/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (109)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 01/28/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/28/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/28/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 01/28/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 01/28/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 02/05/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/05/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 02/05/1992
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 02/05/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 02/27/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/27/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 02/27/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 03/04/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/04/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 03/04/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/04/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 03/04/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 03/04/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/04/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 03/04/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/04/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 03/04/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/04/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 03/04/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/04/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 03/04/1992
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 03/20/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 03/20/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/20/1992
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 03/20/1992
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 03/20/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/20/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/20/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/20/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/20/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/26/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/31/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 03/31/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/31/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/08/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 04/08/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/06/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/06/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/06/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/06/1992
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/06/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/06/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/13/1992
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/13/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/19/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/19/1992
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 05/19/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/19/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 05/19/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/27/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 05/27/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 06/04/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 06/11/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/11/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/17/1992
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 06/17/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/30/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/30/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/30/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/09/1992
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/28/1992
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 07/28/1992
Rep. Colordao, Antonio [D-PR-At Large] 08/04/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 08/11/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 08/11/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/11/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 08/11/1992
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 08/12/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 08/12/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 10/03/1992
Rep. Cox, John W., Jr. [D-IL-16] 10/03/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries11/26/1991 Referred to
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment12/09/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4045.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4045. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/26/1991)

Endangered Species Act Amendments of 1992 - Title I: Recovery Plans - Amends the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to require the Secretary (either the Secretary of the Interior or the Secretary of Commerce, as program responsibilities are vested) to: (1) develop and implement recovery plans by December 31, 1996, for listed endangered and threatened species for which such plans have not been developed as of December 31, 1992; and (2) do the same for such non-listed species as of December 31, 1992, within two years after the species is listed.

Title II: Penalties and Enforcement - Waives the 60-day notice requirement with respect to the filing of a civil suit by an individual in the case of an action against any person respecting an emergency posing a significant risk to the well-being of any listed species of fish or wildlife.

Authorizes the Secretary, the Secretary of the Treasury, and the Secretary of the Department in which the Coast Guard is operating to promulgate regulations to carry out the Convention on International Trade in Endangered Species of Wild Fauna and Flora and the resolutions of its parties as well as to enforce this Act.

Title III: Habitat Conservation Plans - Authorizes the Secretary to enter into a cooperative agreement with any State, municipality, county, or local government to assist in the development of a plan for the conservation of any threatened or endangered species.

Authorizes the Secretary to make grants and loans, under specified conditions, to any such entities: (1) in the development of such plans; (2) to carry out biological and other studies in connection with it; and (3) related tasks.

Establishes the Habitat Conservation Planning Fund for the deposit of all appropriated sums to assist in the development of conservation plans.

Title IV: Authorization of Appropriations - Authorizes appropriations.