There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Steel Trade Liberalization Program Extension Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend the application of the steel trade liberalization program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
11/26/1991Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/27/1991Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
11/26/1991Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/26/1991Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Russo, Martin A. [D-IL-3]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 11/26/1991
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 11/26/1991
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Ridge, Thomas J. [R-PA-21]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 11/26/1991
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 01/28/1992
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 01/28/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 01/28/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 01/28/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/28/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 02/04/1992
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/04/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 02/04/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 02/04/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 02/04/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 02/05/1992
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 02/05/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/07/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/07/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 02/07/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 02/19/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/19/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 02/19/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/25/1992
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 02/25/1992
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 02/25/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/04/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/04/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 03/10/1992
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/10/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/10/1992
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 03/25/1992
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/07/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means11/26/1991 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade11/27/1991 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4051.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4051. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (11/26/1991)

Steel Trade Liberalization Program Extension Act - Amends the Steel Import Stabilization Act to express the sense of the Congress with respect to the quantity of steel products imported into, or exported to, the United States from April 1, 1992, through September 30, 1994, under the steel trade liberalization program.