Text: H.R.4051 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House

 
 
HR 4051 IH
102d CONGRESS
1st Session
 H. R. 4051
To extend the application of the steel trade liberalization program.
IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
November 26, 1991
Mr. VISCLOSKY (for himself, Mr. MURTHA, Mr. APPLEGATE, Mrs. BENTLEY,
Mr. BEVILL, Mr. BROWN, Mr. GAYDOS, Mr. MOLLOHAN, Mr. NOWAK, Mr. OBERSTAR,
Mr. RITTER, Mr. RUSSO, Mr. CAMPBELL of Colorado, Mr. CONYERS, Mr. COYNE,
Mr. DAVIS, Mr. DINGELL, Mr. ECKART, Mr. EVANS, Mr. FEIGHAN, Mr. GUARINI,
Mr. JONTZ, Mr. KANJORSKI, Ms. KAPTUR, Mr. KOSTMAYER, Mr. MCCLOSKEY,
Mr. MCMILLEN of Maryland, Mr. MANTON, Mr. MURPHY, Mr. OWENS of Utah, Mr. PAYNE
of Virginia, Mr. PERKINS, Mr. RAHALL, Mr. RIDGE, Mr. SANTORUM, Mr. STAGGERS,
Mr. STOKES, Mr. TOWNS, and Mr. TRAFICANT) introduced the following bill;
which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means
A BILL
To extend the application of the steel trade liberalization program.
  Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United
  States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.
  This Act may be cited as the `Steel Trade Liberalization Program Extension
  Act'.
SEC. 2. FURTHER EXTENSION OF STEEL TRADE IMPLEMENTATION PROGRAM.
  The Steel Import Stabilization Act (19 U.S.C. 2253 note) is amended by
  inserting after section 803 the following new section:
`SEC. 803A. SENSE OF CONGRESS REGARDING THE FURTHER EXTENSION OF THE STEEL
TRADE IMPLEMENTATION PROGRAM.
  `(a) The Congress finds that--
  `(1) the difficulties that have beset the Uruguay Round of negotiations
  under the General Agreement on Tariffs and Trade have also adversely
  affected negotiations to reach an international consensus regarding the
  steel trade that would achieve the objectives listed in section 803(c);
  `(2) the extension in 1989 of the steel trade liberalization program until
  March 31, 1992, was premised upon an international consensus (commonly
  known as the `Multilateral Steel Accord') regarding the steel trade being
  reached on or before that date; and
  `(3) since the reaching of such an international consensus will be
  significantly delayed, the steel trade liberalization program should
  be extended in order to allow for the orderly transition by the United
  States steel products industry to the open global markets envisioned by
  the Multilateral Steel Accord.
  `(b) In order to provide for the orderly transition referred to in subsection
  (a)(3), it is the sense of Congress that--
  `(1) the aggregate quantity of steel products imported into, or exported
  to, the United States during each of the periods--
  `(A) April 1, 1992, through March 31, 1993,
  `(B) April 1, 1993, through March 31, 1994, and
  `(C) April 1, 1994, through September 30, 1994,
should not exceed an amount that equals 22.7 percent of the United States
market for steel products for that period; and
  `(2) not to exceed 19.1 percent of United States market for steel products
  during each period listed in paragraph (1) shall be allocated among foreign
  countries that enter into bilateral arrangements under the steel trade
  liberalization program.'.
SEC. 3. EFFECTIVE PERIOD.
  Section 806(a) of the Steel Import Stabilization Act is amended--
  (1) by amending paragraph (1) to read as follows:
  `(1) at the close of September 30, 1994, or the date on which a multilateral
  arrangement regarding global steel trade enters into force with respect
  to the United States, whichever date is earlier; or'; and
  (2) by striking out `or seventh' in paragraph (2) and inserting `seventh,
  eighth, or ninth'.