Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/05/1992
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/05/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/05/1992
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 02/05/1992
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 02/05/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/05/1992
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/19/1992
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 03/04/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/20/1992
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/07/1992
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/09/1992