Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/11/1992
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 03/11/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/19/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 04/02/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/02/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/02/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/29/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 04/29/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 07/02/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/04/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 08/04/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 10/04/1992