Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/22/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 01/22/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 02/03/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 02/03/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 02/03/1992
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/03/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4] 02/03/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 02/03/1992
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 02/03/1992
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 02/11/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/11/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 02/11/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/11/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 02/11/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/11/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/11/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 02/11/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 02/11/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 02/18/1992
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 02/18/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 02/25/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 02/25/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/25/1992
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 02/25/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 02/25/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 02/25/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 02/25/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 02/25/1992
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 02/25/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/25/1992
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 02/25/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 02/26/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/26/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/26/1992
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 02/26/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 02/26/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/26/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 02/27/1992
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/27/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/03/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/03/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/03/1992
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 03/03/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 03/03/1992
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 03/09/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 03/09/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 03/09/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/11/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/11/1992
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/11/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 03/11/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/12/1992
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4] 03/24/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/24/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 03/24/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/24/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/24/1992
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/24/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 03/24/1992
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/25/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/25/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 03/25/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 03/25/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 03/25/1992
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 03/26/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/26/1992
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9] 03/26/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/01/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/01/1992
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/01/1992
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 04/01/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/01/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 04/03/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/07/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 04/07/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 04/07/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/07/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/09/1992
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 04/09/1992
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/09/1992
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29] 04/09/1992
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/29/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 04/29/1992
Rep. Luken, Charles [D-OH-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2] 04/29/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/29/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/29/1992
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/29/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 05/06/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/06/1992
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/12/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/12/1992