There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Federal Maritime Commission Authorization Act of 1992

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Maritime Commission Authorization Act of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize appropriations for fiscal year 1993 for the Federal Maritime Commission, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/09/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 102-495.
02/04/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
04/09/1992Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 290.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 102-495.
04/08/1992Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
04/08/1992Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
04/08/1992Subcommittee On Merchant Marine Discharged.
02/06/1992Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine
02/05/1992Executive Comment Requested from Fed Maritime Comm.
02/05/1992Referred to the Subcommittee On Merchant Marine.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
02/04/1992Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 02/04/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries02/04/1992 Referred to
04/08/1992 Markup by
04/09/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-495
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Merchant Marine02/05/1992 Referred to
02/06/1992 Hearings by
04/08/1992 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4156. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (04/09/1992)

Federal Maritime Commission Authorization Act of 1992 - Authorizes appropriations for the Federal Maritime Commission, including a separate authorization for Commission relocation expenses.

Removes provisions of Federal law setting the amount of a bond indemnifying vessel passengers for nonperformance of the transportation.