There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Restrictions on Azerbaijan Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To restrict trade and other relations with the Republic of Azerbaijan.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/04/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
02/24/1992Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/17/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/17/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/17/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/14/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/04/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on International Development, Finance, Trade and Monetary Policy.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
02/04/1992Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/1992Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/1992Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/04/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12]* 02/04/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/20/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 02/20/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 02/20/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/20/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/20/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 02/20/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/20/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/20/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/20/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 02/20/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 02/20/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/03/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/03/1992
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/04/1992
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 03/04/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/04/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/04/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 03/04/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/04/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/1992
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/04/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 03/04/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 03/04/1992
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/18/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/18/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/18/1992
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 03/18/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/18/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/18/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/18/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/18/1992
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 03/18/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/18/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 04/30/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 04/30/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/30/1992
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 04/30/1992
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 04/30/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/19/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/25/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/25/1992

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs02/04/1992 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affrs Subcommittee on International Development, Finance, Trade and Monetary Policy02/04/1992 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs02/04/1992 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East02/17/1992 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations02/17/1992 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade02/17/1992 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/04/1992 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade02/14/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4161.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4161. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/04/1992)

Restrictions on Azerbaijan Act - Requires the United States to continue to deny the following trade and economic benefits to the Republic of Azerbaijan: (1) most-favored-nation status (nondiscriminatory treatment); (2) loans, guarantees, or insurance with respect to U.S. exports to it; (3) beneficiary status under the Generalized System of Preferences; (4) treatment as a country subject to provisions of the Trade Act of 1974 relating to market disruption; (5) treatment as a member of Country Group Y (countries with which the United States has diplomatic or trading relations); (6) any benefit bestowed under the Agreement on Trade Relations Between the United States and the Soviet Union, signed on June 1, 1990; and (7) U.S. assistance under the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961. Requires the United States to impose as a condition to making contributions to any international organizations providing activities in the former Soviet Union that none of the funds be available for such activities, except humanitarian assistance, in Azerbaijan.

Authorizes the President to waive such restrictions.

Terminates such restrictions if the President determines and reports to the Congress that Azerbaijan: (1) has ceased all blockades and uses of force against Armenia and Nagorno-Karabakh; (2) improves the human rights of Armenians, Russians, Jews, and other minorities; and (3) has committed to resolve the Nagorno-Karabakh conflict peacefully.