Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12]* 02/04/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 02/04/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 02/20/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 02/20/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 02/20/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/20/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 02/20/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 02/20/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/20/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/20/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 02/20/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 02/20/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 02/20/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/03/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/03/1992
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/04/1992
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 03/04/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/04/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 03/04/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 03/04/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/04/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/04/1992
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/04/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 03/04/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 03/04/1992
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/18/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/18/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/18/1992
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17] 03/18/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/18/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 03/18/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/18/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 03/18/1992
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 03/18/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/18/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 04/30/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 04/30/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/30/1992
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 04/30/1992
Rep. Early, Joseph D. [D-MA-3] 04/30/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/19/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 06/25/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 06/25/1992