There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Popular Titles

DES Education and Research Amendments bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

DES Education and Research Amendments of 1992

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DES Education and Research Amendments of 1992

Short Titles as Introduced

DES Education and Research Amendments of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide for a program to carry out research on the drug known as diethylstilbestrol, to educate health professionals and the public on the drug, and to provide for certain longitudinal studies regarding individuals who have been exposed to the drug.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/13/1992Became Public Law No: 102-409.
10/13/1992Signed by President.
10/03/1992Presented to President.
09/30/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate in lieu of S. 2837 without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/30/1992Senate Committee on Labor and Human Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/10/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/10/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 102-817.
02/05/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/13/1992Became Public Law No: 102-409.
10/13/1992Signed by President.
10/03/1992HousePresented to President.
10/01/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/30/1992SenatePassed Senate in lieu of S. 2837 without amendment by Voice Vote.
09/30/1992SenateSenate Committee on Labor and Human Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
08/11/1992SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
08/10/1992-2:48pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/10/1992-2:48pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
08/10/1992-2:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
08/10/1992-2:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
08/10/1992-2:30pmHouseMr. Waxman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
08/10/1992HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 462.
08/10/1992HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 102-817.
07/28/1992HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/28/1992HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/23/1992HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment
07/23/1992HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment
02/14/1992HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/05/1992HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
02/05/1992HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 02/05/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 02/05/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/05/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/07/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/20/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/20/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 02/20/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/25/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 02/25/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/03/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/03/1992
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/11/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/12/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/12/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/18/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/18/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/18/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/18/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/18/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 03/24/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/24/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 03/31/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/31/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/01/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 04/01/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 04/01/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/07/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/07/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/07/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/07/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 04/28/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 04/28/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 04/28/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 04/28/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/28/1992
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/28/1992
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/28/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 04/28/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/05/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/05/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/05/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 05/05/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/06/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/06/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/13/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/13/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 05/21/1992
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/03/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 06/03/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/03/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/01/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/02/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/21/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/21/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 07/27/1992
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 07/28/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/29/1992

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/05/1992 Referred to
07/28/1992 Markup by
08/10/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-817
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment02/14/1992 Referred to
07/23/1992 Markup by
07/23/1992 Reported by
Senate Labor and Human Resources08/11/1992 Referred to
09/30/1992 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4178. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/10/1992)

DES Education and Research Amendments of 1992 - Amends the Public Health Service Act to establish a program for the conduct and support of research and training, the dissemination of health information, and other measures with respect to the diagnosis and treatment of conditions associated with exposure to the drug diethylstilbestrol (DES).

Mandates: (1) programs to educate health professionals and the public; and (2) longitudinal studies regarding certain diseases or disorders.

Authorizes appropriations.