Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 02/05/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 02/05/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/05/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 02/05/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/07/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/20/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/20/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 02/20/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/25/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 02/25/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 03/03/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/03/1992
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/11/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 03/12/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/12/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/18/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/18/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/18/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/18/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/18/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 03/24/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 03/24/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 03/31/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 03/31/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/01/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 04/01/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 04/01/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/07/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/07/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/07/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 04/07/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 04/28/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 04/28/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 04/28/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 04/28/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/28/1992
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/28/1992
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/28/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 04/28/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 05/05/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/05/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/05/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 05/05/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 05/06/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6] 05/06/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/13/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/13/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 05/21/1992
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5] 06/03/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 06/03/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/03/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/01/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/02/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/21/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/21/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 07/27/1992
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 07/28/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/29/1992