There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 23, United States Code, to repeal a penalty for noncompliance by States with a program requiring the use of safety belts and motorcycle helmets.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/07/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/21/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Public Works and Transportation
02/07/1992Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/07/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (67)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/07/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/07/1992
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6]* 02/07/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/07/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 02/07/1992
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 02/19/1992
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 02/19/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 02/19/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 03/03/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/03/1992
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 03/03/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 03/03/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 03/03/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/03/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/05/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/12/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 03/12/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/18/1992
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/18/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/18/1992
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 03/18/1992
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 03/24/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/24/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/24/1992
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/24/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/24/1992
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/26/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/26/1992
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 04/01/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/01/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/07/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 04/07/1992
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 04/29/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/29/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 04/29/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 04/29/1992
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/12/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 05/12/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/12/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/12/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/12/1992
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/20/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/20/1992
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 05/20/1992
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/03/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 06/03/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 06/03/1992
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/03/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/16/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/16/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/16/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 07/01/1992
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/22/1992
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 07/22/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 07/27/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 07/27/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 07/29/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 07/31/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 09/10/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 09/10/1992
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 09/18/1992
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3] 10/02/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 10/02/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Public Works and Transportation02/07/1992 Referred to
House Public Works and Transportation Subcommittee on Surface Transportation02/21/1992 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4207. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/07/1992)

Repeals penalties for noncompliance by States with a program requiring the use of safety belts and motorcycle helmets.