There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Resolution Trust Corporation Funding Act of 1992

Short Titles as Introduced

Resolution Trust Corporation Funding Act of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide funding for the Resolution Trust Corporation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
03/19/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs. H. Rept. 102-457.
02/18/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date All Actions
03/19/1992Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 274.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/1992Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs. H. Rept. 102-457.
03/12/1992Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
03/12/1992Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
02/27/1992Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Financial Institutions Supervision, Regulation and Insurance
02/27/1992Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Financial Institutions Supervision, Regulation and Insurance
02/26/1992Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Financial Institutions Supervision, Regulation and Insurance
02/24/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions Supervision, Regulation and Insurance.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
02/18/1992Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/18/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs02/18/1992 Referred to
03/12/1992 Markup by
03/19/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-457
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Financial Institutions Supervision, Regulation and Insurance02/24/1992 Referred to
02/26/1992 Hearings by
02/27/1992 Markup by
02/27/1992 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4241. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (03/19/1992)

Resolution Trust Corporation Funding Act of 1992 - Amends the Federal Home Loan Bank Act (as amended by the Resolution Trust Corporation Refinancing, Restructuring, and Improvement Act of 1991), to: (1) repeal the termination of the mandate for specified additional funding for the Resolution Trust Corporation (RTC); and (2) specify that the additional interim funding (already authorized) which the Secretary of the Treasury must provide to the RTC must come out of any money in the Treasury not otherwise appropriated.

Directs the Secretary, at the President's request, to provide until April 1, 1993, further additional funds of up to $25,000,000,000 to the RTC out of any money in the Treasury not otherwise appropriated to it.