Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/19/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 03/11/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/11/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/11/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 03/11/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 03/11/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/11/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 03/11/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 03/11/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/11/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/11/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/11/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 03/11/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 03/11/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 04/09/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 04/09/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 04/09/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/09/1992
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 04/09/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/09/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/09/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/09/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 04/09/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/09/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/06/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/06/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 05/06/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/06/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 05/06/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/06/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 05/06/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 05/06/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/06/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 07/21/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 07/21/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/21/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/21/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 07/21/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 07/21/1992
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29] 07/21/1992
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 09/23/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/23/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/23/1992
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 09/23/1992