Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 02/25/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 02/25/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/03/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/03/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/03/1992
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 03/03/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16] 03/03/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 03/03/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/03/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/05/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 03/05/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/05/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6] 03/05/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/05/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/05/1992
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 03/05/1992
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 03/05/1992
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 03/05/1992
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/05/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/05/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 03/05/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/05/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 03/05/1992
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10] 03/05/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/11/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/11/1992
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 03/11/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/11/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 03/11/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/11/1992
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 03/11/1992
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-26] 03/19/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/19/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 03/19/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/19/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/19/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 03/19/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/19/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/19/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/19/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/19/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 03/19/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 03/26/1992
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 03/26/1992
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/26/1992
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 03/26/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 03/26/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/26/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/26/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/07/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12] 04/07/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 04/07/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 04/30/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 04/30/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 04/30/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 04/30/1992
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 04/30/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/30/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 05/13/1992
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 05/13/1992
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/13/1992
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 05/13/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/17/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 06/17/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 08/12/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 10/02/1992