Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 02/25/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 02/25/1992
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Fuster, Jamie B. [D-PR-At Large]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 02/25/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 02/25/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/17/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/17/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/17/1992
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 03/17/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 03/17/1992
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19] 03/17/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 03/17/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 03/17/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 03/17/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/17/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/17/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 03/17/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/17/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 03/17/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 03/17/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/17/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 03/17/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 04/09/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/09/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/06/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/06/1992
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/03/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 06/03/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/03/1992
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 06/03/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/03/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 06/03/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/03/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 06/03/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 06/03/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/03/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 06/03/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 06/03/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 06/16/1992
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/16/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 06/16/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/16/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/23/1992