There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To suspend certain compliance and accountability measures under the National School Lunch Act.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/27/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/27/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary and Vocational Education.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
02/27/1992Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (147)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 03/12/1992
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/12/1992
Rep. Staggers, Harley O., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/12/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 03/12/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/12/1992
Rep. Thornton, Ray [D-AR-2] 03/12/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 03/12/1992
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/12/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5] 03/12/1992
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 03/12/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 03/12/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/12/1992
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 03/12/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 03/12/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 03/12/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 03/12/1992
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2] 03/12/1992
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 03/12/1992
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 03/12/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 03/12/1992
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 03/12/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/12/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/12/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 03/12/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/12/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/12/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/12/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 03/12/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/12/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/12/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 03/12/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/12/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 03/12/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 03/12/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/12/1992
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 03/12/1992
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 03/12/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/12/1992
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 03/12/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/12/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 03/12/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/12/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 03/12/1992
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 03/12/1992
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 03/12/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/12/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6] 03/12/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/19/1992
Rep. Andrews, Michael [D-TX-25] 03/19/1992
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/19/1992
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 03/19/1992
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 03/19/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/19/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/19/1992
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/19/1992
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 03/19/1992
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 03/19/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/19/1992
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 03/19/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/19/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 03/19/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 03/19/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 03/19/1992
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 03/19/1992
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 03/19/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/19/1992
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/08/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/08/1992
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 04/08/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 04/08/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 04/08/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 04/08/1992
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/08/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 04/08/1992
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 04/08/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 04/08/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18] 04/08/1992
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/08/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 04/08/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 04/08/1992
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 04/08/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/08/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/08/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/08/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/08/1992
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/08/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/08/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 04/08/1992
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 04/08/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 04/08/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 04/08/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/08/1992
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 04/08/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/08/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/08/1992
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/08/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/08/1992
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 04/08/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/28/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/28/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/28/1992
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/28/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 05/28/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 05/28/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/28/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 05/28/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/28/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 05/28/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 05/28/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/28/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 05/28/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/28/1992
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 05/28/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 05/28/1992
Rep. Jones, Ben [D-GA-4] 05/28/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 05/28/1992
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/28/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/28/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2] 05/28/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/28/1992
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/28/1992
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 05/28/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/28/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/28/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 05/28/1992
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 05/28/1992
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/28/1992
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 05/28/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8] 05/28/1992
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 05/28/1992
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/28/1992
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 05/28/1992
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 05/28/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/28/1992
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 05/28/1992
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 06/25/1992
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 06/25/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 06/25/1992
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 06/25/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 06/25/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/25/1992
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/25/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/16/1992
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 09/16/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor02/27/1992 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Elementary, Secondary, and Vocational Education03/27/1992 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4338. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/1992)

Amends the National School Lunch Act to suspend specified compliance and accountability rules issued by the Secretary of Agriculture.