Summary: H.R.4342 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/09/1992)

Expands eligibility for the veterans' readjustment appointment program (a program providing Federal employment opportunities for veterans) to include all Vietnam era veterans (currently includes Vietnam era veterans with service-connected disabilities or those having received campaign badges for active-duty service in a campaign or expedition).

Expands eligibility for the disabled veterans' outreach program to include disabled veterans of the Persian Gulf War.

Extends the veterans' readjustment appointment program through December 31, 1999. Authorizes a qualified veteran to receive such an appointment only within the ten-year period following the later of the veteran's last discharge or release from active duty or December 31 (currently, December 18), 1989.

Increases the amount of monthly basic educational assistance provided under the Montgomery GI Bill educational assistance program for members of the all-volunteer active-duty forces and the Selected Reserve. Makes such increase permanent. (Currently, such increases are permitted only for the interim period between October 1, 1991, and September 30, 1993.)

Extends through December 31, 1995 (currently, 1994) the time during which an individual may be considered a Vietnam era veteran for purposes of eligibility for the Vietnam veterans' employment and training program.

Removes the requirement that veterans' organizations need to be federally chartered in order to be represented on the Advisory Committee on Veterans Employment and Training.