There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Beverage Container Reuse and Recycling Act of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Solid Waste Disposal Act to require a refund value for certain beverage containers, and to provide resources for State pollution prevention and recycling programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/27/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/13/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/27/1992Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 02/27/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 02/27/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/27/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/27/1992
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-17]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/27/1992
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18] 03/25/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/25/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/25/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/01/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/01/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/29/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 07/23/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 07/31/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce02/27/1992 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials03/13/1992 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4343. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/1992)

National Beverage Container Reuse and Recycling Act of 1992 - Amends the Solid Waste Disposal Act to prohibit the sale of beer, mineral water, soda water, wine coolers, or carbonated soft drinks in beverage containers by retailers and distributors unless such containers carry a refund value of ten cents. Requires distributors to collect from retailers the refund value for each beverage sold to such retailers. Directs retailers to collect from consumers the refund value for each beverage sold to such consumers. Requires retailers and distributors to pay the refund on returned containers of brands (in the same kind and size of container) sold by such retailers or distributors.

Directs distributors to pay annually to a State unclaimed refund amounts (the amount by which the total refund value of all containers sold by such distributors exceeds the amount paid by distributors to persons in that State). Makes unclaimed refunds available to a State for carrying out pollution prevention and recycling programs.

Prohibits distributors and retailers from: (1) selling beverages in metal beverage containers with detachable openings; and (2) disposing of containers subject to this Act or any metal, glass, or plastic from such containers (other than the top or seal) in landfills or solid waste disposal facilities.

Makes this Act inapplicable to States that have adopted requirements identical to those under this Act or that have demonstrated achievement of a recycling or reuse rate for beverage containers of at least 70 percent. Makes States that fail to maintain such rate for a consecutive 12-month period subject to this Act's requirements.

Prohibits States or political subdivisions that impose taxes on the sale of beverage containers from imposing any tax on the amount attributable to the refund value of such containers.

Requires the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to promulgate regulations to provide for the adjustment for inflation of the ten-cent refund amount at ten-year intervals.

Prescribes civil penalties for violations of this Act.