Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 02/27/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 03/04/1992
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 03/04/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5] 03/04/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 03/04/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/10/1992
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/10/1992
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/10/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/10/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/17/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 03/17/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 03/24/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/24/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 04/29/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/29/1992