Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 03/05/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/05/1992
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 03/05/1992
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4]* 03/05/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7]* 03/05/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 03/31/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 03/31/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 03/31/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 03/31/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/31/1992
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 03/31/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 03/31/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/21/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 05/21/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/21/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/21/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/21/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2] 05/21/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/21/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/21/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 05/21/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/21/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 05/21/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 05/21/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/21/1992
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 05/21/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 05/21/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 05/21/1992
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 05/21/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/21/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/17/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 06/17/1992
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 06/17/1992
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/17/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 06/17/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/17/1992
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/17/1992
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 06/17/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/17/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/30/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/30/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 06/30/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/30/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/30/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/07/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/07/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 09/10/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/1992