There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Freedom from Government Competition Act of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require that the Federal Government procure from the private sector the goods and services necessary for the operations and management of certain Government agencies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/11/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/16/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
Action By: Committee on Government Operations
03/11/1992Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/11/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/18/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 03/18/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 03/19/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 03/19/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 03/20/1992
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 03/20/1992
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 03/20/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/24/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 03/25/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/31/1992
Rep. Vucanovich, Barbara F. [R-NV-2] 03/31/1992
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/01/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/03/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/03/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/07/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/07/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 04/28/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/28/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 05/05/1992
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/06/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 06/18/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 06/22/1992
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/22/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/22/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/30/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Operations03/11/1992 Referred to
House Government Operations Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security03/16/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4430.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4430. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/11/1992)

Freedom from Government Competition Act of 1992 - Requires Federal agencies to obtain all goods and services necessary for or beneficial to the accomplishment of their authorized functions by procurement from private sources unless: (1) the goods or services are required by law to be produced or performed, respectively, by the agency; (2) or the head of the agency determines and certifies to the Congress that Government production, manufacture, or provision of a good or service is necessary for national defense, that a good or service is so inherently governmental in nature that it is in the public interest to require production or performance by a Government employee, or that there is no private source capable of providing the good or service.

Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget to study and report to the Congress on: (1) agency activities which are inconsistent with such requirements; and (2) a schedule for transferring such activities to the private sector.