Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/11/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 03/11/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/25/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 03/25/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 03/25/1992
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 03/25/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/25/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17] 03/25/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 03/25/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/25/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 03/25/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 05/05/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18] 06/11/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/11/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 07/09/1992