Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 04/09/1992
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/09/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 04/09/1992
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 04/09/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/09/1992
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 04/09/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 04/29/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 04/29/1992
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/29/1992
Rep. Tallon, Robert M. (Robin) [D-SC-6] 04/29/1992
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 04/29/1992
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/29/1992
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 04/29/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/29/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8] 04/29/1992
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/29/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 04/29/1992
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/29/1992
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 04/29/1992
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/29/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 04/29/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 04/29/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 04/29/1992
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 04/29/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/29/1992
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/29/1992
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 04/29/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 04/29/1992
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 04/29/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 04/29/1992
Rep. Gallo, Dean A. [R-NJ-11] 04/29/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/29/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Peterson, Douglas (Pete) [D-FL-2] 04/29/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 04/29/1992
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/04/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/04/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 05/04/1992
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 05/04/1992
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/04/1992
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/04/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/04/1992
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 05/04/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/04/1992
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/04/1992
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 05/04/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 05/04/1992
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 05/04/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 05/04/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 05/04/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 05/04/1992
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/04/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/04/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 05/04/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 05/04/1992
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 05/04/1992
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 05/04/1992
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3] 05/04/1992
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 05/04/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 05/04/1992
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/04/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/04/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 05/04/1992
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/06/1992
Rep. Sarpalius, Bill [D-TX-13] 05/06/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 05/06/1992
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/06/1992
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 05/06/1992
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/06/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 05/06/1992
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 05/06/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/06/1992
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/06/1992
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/06/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/06/1992
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/06/1992
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 05/06/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 05/06/1992
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/06/1992
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6] 05/06/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 05/06/1992
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 05/06/1992
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 05/06/1992
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/06/1992
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/06/1992
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 05/06/1992
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 05/06/1992
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/06/1992
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/06/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/06/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 05/06/1992
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 05/06/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 05/12/1992
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/12/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 05/12/1992
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/12/1992
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 05/12/1992
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 05/12/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/12/1992
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 05/12/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/12/1992
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2] 05/12/1992
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/12/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/12/1992
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-44] 05/12/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 05/12/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 05/12/1992
Rep. Allen, George [R-VA-7] 05/12/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/12/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 05/12/1992
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 05/14/1992
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 05/14/1992
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/14/1992
Rep. Henry, Paul B. [R-MI-5] 05/14/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/14/1992
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/14/1992
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 05/14/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 05/14/1992
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 05/14/1992
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 05/14/1992
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8] 05/14/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 05/14/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/14/1992
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/14/1992
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 05/14/1992
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 05/14/1992
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/14/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/14/1992
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 05/14/1992
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/14/1992
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 05/14/1992
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/14/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/14/1992