Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 03/18/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/07/1992
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4] 04/28/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/28/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 05/05/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/05/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 05/05/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 05/27/1992
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4] 05/27/1992
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/27/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 05/27/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/02/1992
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/18/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 09/09/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/24/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/01/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew