Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/18/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Valentine, Tim [D-NC-2]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Brewster, Bill K. [D-OK-3]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 03/18/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/09/1992
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 04/09/1992
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9] 04/09/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8] 04/09/1992
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 04/09/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/09/1992
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-21] 04/09/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/09/1992
Rep. McCandless, Alfred A. (Al) [R-CA-37] 04/09/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 04/09/1992
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 04/09/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 05/05/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 05/05/1992
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 05/05/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 05/05/1992
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/05/1992
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/05/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6] 05/05/1992
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/05/1992
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 05/05/1992
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/05/1992
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 05/05/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 05/05/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/05/1992
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/05/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/05/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 05/05/1992
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/05/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/05/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/05/1992
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2] 05/05/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 05/05/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 05/05/1992
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/05/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/12/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/12/1992
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 05/12/1992
Rep. LaRocco, Larry [D-ID-1] 05/12/1992
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 05/12/1992
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-33] 05/12/1992
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 05/12/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/12/1992
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 05/12/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 05/12/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 05/12/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/12/1992
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/12/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 05/12/1992
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 05/12/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 05/12/1992
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/12/1992
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 05/18/1992
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-38] 05/18/1992
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-15] 05/18/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 05/18/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 05/18/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 05/18/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 05/21/1992
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 05/21/1992
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 05/21/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/21/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/21/1992
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4] 06/02/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/02/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/02/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 06/02/1992
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 06/02/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2] 06/02/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/02/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 06/02/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/02/1992
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 06/02/1992
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/09/1992
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 06/09/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 06/09/1992
Rep. Nagle, Dave R, [D-IA-3] 06/09/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/09/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/09/1992
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-12] 06/17/1992
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 06/17/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 06/17/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/18/1992
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/18/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 06/18/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 06/18/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25] 06/23/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/23/1992
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7] 06/23/1992
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/23/1992
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 06/23/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 06/23/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/08/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/08/1992
Rep. Meyers, Jan [R-KS-3] 07/21/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 07/21/1992
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 07/21/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/21/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 07/22/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/22/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 08/04/1992
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 08/04/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 08/04/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 08/04/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 08/04/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/17/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/30/1992
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 09/30/1992