There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

International Peacekeeping Act of 1992

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

International Peacekeeping Act of 1992

Short Titles as Introduced

International Peacekeeping Act of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize contributions to United Nations peacekeeping activities.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
07/02/1992Became Public Law No: 102-311.
07/02/1992Signed by President.
06/24/1992Presented to President.
06/23/1992Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
06/15/1992Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
03/24/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
07/02/1992Became Public Law No: 102-311.
07/02/1992Signed by President.
06/24/1992HousePresented to President.
06/24/1992SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/23/1992SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
06/16/1992SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 485.
06/15/1992-12:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/15/1992-12:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/15/1992-12:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
06/15/1992-12:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
06/15/1992-12:10pmHouseMr. Fascell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/10/1992HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
06/10/1992HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
03/24/1992HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs Marked-Up and Ordered Reported Draft Legislation on (March 11, 1992).
03/24/1992HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/24/1992HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/24/1992 Referred to
06/10/1992 Markup by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4548.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4548. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/15/1992)

International Peacekeeping Act of 1992 - Authorizes additional appropriations for FY 1992 and 1993 for U.S. contributions to United Nations peacekeeping activities.

Authorizes additional appropriations for FY 1993 for contributions to international organizations.