There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To rescind certain budget authority proposed to be rescinded (R92-87) in a special message transmitted to the Congress by the President on March 20, 1992, in accordance with section 1012 of the Impoundment Control Act of 1974.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/26/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/26/1992Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/26/1992
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-15] 04/08/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 04/08/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 04/08/1992
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 04/08/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 04/08/1992
Rep. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ-4] 04/08/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 04/08/1992
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 04/08/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/09/1992
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 04/09/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 04/09/1992
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18] 04/09/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-20] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 04/09/1992
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-33] 04/09/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Chandler, Rod D. [R-WA-8] 04/09/1992
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 04/09/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 04/09/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/09/1992
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9] 05/28/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 08/04/1992
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 04/09/1992 04/30/1992 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations03/26/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4670.


Subjects (11)

  • Appropriations
  • Executive impoundment of appropriated funds
  • Federal aid to housing
  • Hawaii
  • Housing finance
  • Income tax
  • Rental housing
  • Tax credits
  • Tax deductions

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4670. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/26/1992)

Rescinds certain budget authority proposed to be rescinded (R92-87) (study of tax law changes relating to residential ground lease financing, Hawaii Real Estate Commission) in a special message transmitted to the Congress by the President on March 20, 1992, in accordance with the Impoundment Control Act of 1974.