Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 04/29/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 04/29/1992
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 04/29/1992
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 04/29/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/29/1992
Rep. Chapman, Jim [D-TX-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/29/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/29/1992
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 04/29/1992
Rep. Miller, John R. [R-WA-1] 04/29/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 05/05/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 05/05/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 05/07/1992
Rep. Blaz, Ben G. [R-GU-At Large] 05/07/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 05/07/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/07/1992
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 05/19/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8] 05/28/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/28/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/23/1992
Rep. Bustamante, Albert G. [D-TX-23] 07/02/1992
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/23/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 08/05/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/09/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/15/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/15/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/15/1992
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 09/15/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/15/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 09/18/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 09/23/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/30/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 09/30/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/05/1992