There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Climate Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To stabilize emissions of carbon dioxide to protect the global climate.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/02/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/10/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/02/1992Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/02/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (146)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 04/02/1992
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/02/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/09/1992
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/09/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/09/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 04/09/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/09/1992
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/09/1992
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/09/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/28/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/28/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 04/28/1992
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/28/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 04/28/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/28/1992
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 04/28/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/28/1992
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 04/28/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/28/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/28/1992
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/28/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/28/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/28/1992
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/28/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/28/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 04/28/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/30/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/07/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 06/11/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/11/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 10/05/1992
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Collins, Barbara-Rose [D-MI-13] 04/09/1992 04/29/1992 --
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/28/1992 05/07/1992 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/02/1992 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power04/10/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4750.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4750. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/02/1992)

Global Climate Protection Act - Directs the President to promulgate final regulations that will achieve stabilization of carbon dioxide emissions by January 1, 2000.

Requires the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to evaluate and report biennially to the Congress on the progress made pursuant to such regulations. Directs the President to promulgate additional regulations to achieve stabilization if the Administrator finds that the regulations will not achieve stabilization.

Permits citizen suits against officers of the United States for failures to perform duties in accordance with this Act.