Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-19]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-25]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Orton, Bill [D-UT-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16]* 04/02/1992
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-28]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Andrews, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Owens, Wayne [D-UT-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Wheat, Alan [D-MO-5]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Coleman, Ronald D. [D-TX-16]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/02/1992
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-18]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Horn, Joan Kelly [D-MO-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Washington, Craig A. [D-TX-18]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Swett, Dick [D-NH-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-10]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-6]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA-6]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-17]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3]* 04/02/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/09/1992
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 04/09/1992
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/09/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-27] 04/09/1992
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/09/1992
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-9] 04/09/1992
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 04/09/1992
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/09/1992
Rep. Reed, Jack [D-RI-2] 04/09/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/09/1992
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 04/09/1992
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/09/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/28/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 04/28/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 04/28/1992
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/28/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 04/28/1992
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/28/1992
Rep. Donnelly, Brian J. [D-MA-11] 04/28/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/28/1992
Rep. Hoagland, Peter [D-NE-2] 04/28/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/28/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/28/1992
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 04/28/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 04/28/1992
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/28/1992
Rep. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE-At Large] 04/28/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 04/28/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 04/28/1992
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/30/1992
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/07/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23] 06/11/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/11/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 10/05/1992

Show cosponsors who withdrew