Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Zimmer, Dick [R-NJ-12] 04/29/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 05/06/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 05/14/1992
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/20/1992
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-17] 05/28/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14] 06/10/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 06/16/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 07/24/1992
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 07/28/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/22/1992