Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-8]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Slattery, Jim [D-KS-2]* 04/28/1992
Rep. McMillan, J. Alex [R-NC-9]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Sikorski, Gerry E. [D-MN-6]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Bryant, John W. [D-TX-5]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Holloway, Clyde [R-LA-8]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-4]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-9]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11]* 04/28/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Lehman, Richard H. [D-CA-18]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7]* 04/28/1992
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/05/1992
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/05/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/14/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/14/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 05/14/1992
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/10/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/16/1992
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/16/1992
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 07/22/1992
Rep. Mfume, Kweisi [D-MD-7] 07/22/1992
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 07/22/1992
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/09/1992
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 09/17/1992