Committees: H.R.5013 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries04/29/1992 Referred to
07/01/1992 Markup by
07/29/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-749 Part 1
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment05/04/1992 Referred to
06/16/1992 Hearings by
06/25/1992 Markup by
06/25/1992 Reported by
House Ways and Means04/29/1992 Referred to
07/29/1992 Markup by
07/31/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-749 Part 2
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade05/04/1992 Referred to
06/16/1992 Hearings by
07/23/1992 Markup by
07/23/1992 Reported by
Senate Environment and Public Works08/12/1992 Referred to
09/30/1992 Discharged from