Committees: H.R.5087 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/06/1992 Referred to
07/23/1992 Markup by
07/29/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-751 Part 1
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment07/09/1992 Referred to
07/09/1992 Markup by
07/09/1992 Reported by
House Armed Services07/29/1992 Referred to
08/07/1992 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs08/11/1992 Referred to
09/25/1992 Discharged from