There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit United States assistance to Serbia and Montenegro.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/07/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
05/18/1992Executive Comment Requested from State.
05/12/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/12/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/07/1992Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/07/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-18]* 05/07/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 05/14/1992
Rep. Feighan, Edward F. [D-OH-19] 05/14/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1] 05/14/1992
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-7] 05/14/1992
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/14/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/14/1992
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 05/14/1992
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-11] 05/14/1992
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-42] 05/14/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27] 05/14/1992
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/19/1992
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/19/1992
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-11] 05/19/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1] 05/19/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30] 05/19/1992
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 05/28/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/28/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/28/1992
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 05/28/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 05/28/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/28/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/28/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/28/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/28/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 05/28/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 05/28/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 05/28/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/28/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29] 06/25/1992
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/25/1992
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Hayes, Charles A. [D-IL-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Mrazek, Robert J. [D-NY-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL-20] 06/25/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/25/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9] 06/25/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32] 06/25/1992
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 06/25/1992
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-14] 06/25/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 06/25/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 06/25/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/25/1992
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/25/1992
Rep. Atkins, Chester G. [D-MA-5] 08/06/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/06/1992
Rep. Richardson, Bill [D-NM-3] 08/06/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/05/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs05/07/1992 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East05/12/1992 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations05/12/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5117.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5117. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/07/1992)

Prohibits U.S. assistance to Serbia and Montenegro or any successor entity and requires the President to block all assets of the former Yugoslavian Government until he certifies to the Congress that: (1) Serbia and Montenegro have withdrawn their forces from Croatia and Bosnia-Hercegovina; and (2) the government of Serbia and Montenegro or any successor entity is democratically-elected and recognizes the territorial integrity of neighboring states and the political rights of Kosovo.

Urges President Bush to withdraw U.S. recognition of Yugoslavia and to refuse to recognize Serbian and Montenegrin claims as a successor state.

Supports withholding formal recognition of Serbia and Montenegro until all Serbian military, paramilitary, and irregular units are withdrawn from Bosnia-Hercegovina, Slovenia, and Croatia and until Serbia and Montenegro respect the territorial integrity of neighboring nations.

Calls upon the administration to impose an "air cap" to provide protection to Bosnia-Hercegovina and Croatia, as is being afforded to the Kurds in Iraq.

Supports the immediate provision of humanitarian and refugee assistance for the victims of war in Bosnia-Hercegovina and Croatia.

Urges President Bush to call for a special meeting of the United Nations Security Council to adopt a resolution calling on member countries to: (1) suspend aid to Serbia and Montenegro; (2) block Serbian assets; (3) participate in an international trade embargo of Yugoslavia; (4) withdraw recognition of the Yugoslavian Government; and (5) terminate Yugoslavia's membership in international and multilateral organizations.