There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Breast Cancer Strategy Act of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act with respect to research on breast cancer.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/13/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
06/05/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/13/1992Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/13/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 05/13/1992
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-32]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-29]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Hochbrueckner, George J. [D-NY-1]* 05/13/1992
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-23]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-5]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Kolter, Joseph P. [D-PA-4]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-30]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Unsoeld, Jolene [D-WA-3]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/13/1992
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Machtley, Ronald K. [R-RI-1]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-29]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-12]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Levine, Mel [D-CA-27]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1]* 05/13/1992
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/18/1992
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-16] 06/29/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/29/1992
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/29/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/07/1992
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 07/07/1992
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/28/1992
Rep. Smith, Lawrence [D-FL-16] 07/28/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 07/28/1992
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/28/1992
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-20] 08/12/1992
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-10] 08/12/1992

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce05/13/1992 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment06/05/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5156.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5156. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/13/1992)

National Breast Cancer Strategy Act of 1992 - Title I: Establishment of Office of Breast Cancer and National Breast Cancer Commission - Amends the Public Health Service Act to establish: (1) the Office of Breast Cancer in the Office of the Assistant Secretary for Health; and (2) the National Breast Cancer Commission to study public and private breast cancer prevention, early detection, treatment, education, and research.

Title II: Duties of Director of the National Cancer Institute Relating to Breast Cancer - Authorizes appropriations for conducting and supporting breast cancer research.

Adds biomedical and behavioral research, training, and dissemination of information regarding breast cancer to the duties of the National Cancer Institute Director.

Establishes the Rose Kushner Scholarship Program of scholarships in exchange for completing post-graduate clinical oncology training and serving as National Institutes of Health (NIH) employees carrying out breast cancer programs.

Establishes a program of educational loan repayments in exchange for breast cancer activities as NIH employees.

Authorizes appropriations for at least ten programs for research on breast, lung, and prostate cancer under designated Specialized Programs of Research Excellence.