There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Military Retiree and Veteran Health Care Act of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, and title XVIII of the Social Security Act to permit the reimbursement of expenses incurred by a medical facility of the uniformed services or the Department of Veterans Affairs in providing health care to persons eligible for care under medicare.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/19/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
06/15/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/22/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
05/22/1992Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
05/21/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
05/19/1992Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/19/1992Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/19/1992Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/19/1992Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/19/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-35] 09/10/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/10/1992

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services05/19/1992 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation05/22/1992 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce05/19/1992 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment06/15/1992 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs05/19/1992 Referred to
House Ways and Means05/19/1992 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health05/21/1992 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5199.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5199. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/19/1992)

Military Retiree and Veteran Health Care Act of 1992 - Entitles members and former members of the armed forces and their dependents who are eligible for medical or dental care in any military facility and who are also entitled to health insurance under title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to receive medical or dental care in any military facility. Directs the facility providing such services to recover the costs of such care from Medicare Subvention funding. Provides for the deposit of funds received by a military medical treatment or Department of Veterans Affairs facility from Medicare Subvention funding for the provision of such care. Allows a covered beneficiary of a member or former member of the armed forces who is also entitled to hospital insurance benefits under Medicare to receive care in a military treatment facility and to have the Medicare hospital insurance benefits paid to such military treatment facility for the care so provided. Provides that, in the case of health care services incurred on behalf of covered beneficiaries, collection may be made from any third party payer, including the appropriate program under Medicare or title XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act. (Currently, collection from a plan administered by Medicare or Medicaid is prohibited.)

Prohibits medical or dental care from being provided to an otherwise eligible person at a military treatment facility only if the senior or commanding officer of such facility determines that such facility cannot provide the particular care required because of lack of space or facilities or because such type of care is not provided at such facility. Requires the administering Secretary to be advised immediately when a determination to deny treatment is made, with a verifiable date as to when the restriction will be removed.

Amends Medicare provisions to make Department of Defense and Department of Veterans Affairs treatment facilities eligible for Medicare payments as long as they meet requirements applicable to hospitals and skilled nursing facilities under title XVIII.