Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Patterson, Elizabeth [D-SC-4]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Hayes, James A. [D-LA-7]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Kopetski, Mike [D-OR-5]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-7]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Ravenel, Arthur, Jr. [R-SC-1]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-14]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 05/20/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 05/27/1992
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 05/27/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/28/1992
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/02/1992
Rep. Natcher, William H. [D-KY-2] 06/02/1992
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/04/1992
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/29/1992
Rep. Bacchus, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/30/1992
Rep. Blackwell, Lucien E. [D-PA-2] 07/08/1992
Rep. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO-3] 07/22/1992
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 07/23/1992
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-3] 07/29/1992
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/30/1992
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-19] 07/30/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/04/1992
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 08/12/1992
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/12/1992
Rep. Solarz, Stephen J. [D-NY-13] 08/12/1992
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 09/09/1992
Rep. Parker, Mike [D-MS-4] 09/09/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 09/09/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/10/1992
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/10/1992
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 09/15/1992
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/15/1992
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-3] 09/15/1992
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/15/1992
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 09/15/1992
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/18/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 09/18/1992
Rep. Perkins, Carl C. [D-KY-7] 09/21/1992
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/21/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/21/1992
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [R-FL-10] 09/21/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/21/1992
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/21/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 09/21/1992
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 09/22/1992
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-17] 09/22/1992
Rep. James, Craig T. [R-FL-4] 09/22/1992
Rep. Harris, Claude [D-AL-7] 09/22/1992
Rep. Bilbray, James H. [D-NV-1] 09/24/1992
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/24/1992
Rep. Erdreich, Ben [D-AL-6] 09/24/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 09/24/1992
Rep. Johnston, Harry [D-FL-14] 09/29/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/29/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/29/1992
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 09/29/1992
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 09/29/1992
Rep. Browder, Glen [D-AL-3] 10/02/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 10/02/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1] 10/02/1992
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/05/1992