Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stallings, Richard H. [D-ID-2]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Long, Jill L. [D-IN-4]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Jontz, Jim [D-IN-5]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Volkmer, Harold L. [D-MO-9]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Olin, James R. [D-VA-6]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Penny, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/28/1992
Rep. McCloskey, Frank [D-IN-8] 05/28/1992
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/28/1992
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/28/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 05/28/1992
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-22] 05/28/1992
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-2] 05/28/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 06/03/1992
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/03/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/03/1992
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/03/1992
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 06/03/1992
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/03/1992
Rep. McMillen, Thomas [D-MD-4] 06/09/1992
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2] 06/11/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/11/1992
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 06/17/1992
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-10] 06/17/1992
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/17/1992
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6] 06/17/1992
Rep. Coleman, E. Thomas [R-MO-6] 06/22/1992
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-10] 06/22/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 06/23/1992
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/23/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 06/24/1992
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/24/1992
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3] 06/25/1992
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/29/1992
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 06/29/1992
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 07/01/1992
Rep. Lancaster, H. Martin [D-NC-3] 07/01/1992
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 07/21/1992
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/21/1992
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/21/1992
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 07/21/1992
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-2] 07/21/1992
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 07/23/1992
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/24/1992
Rep. Thomas, Craig [R-WY-At Large] 07/28/1992
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 07/31/1992