There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Revitalization of Health and Education in Rural America Act of 1992

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a grant program to improve the provision of health care services and educational services in rural areas by enabling providers of such services to obtain access to modern interactive telecommunications systems, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
05/21/1992Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
07/10/1992Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from USDA.
06/25/1992Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
06/25/1992For Further Action See H.R.5237.
06/03/1992Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, and Rural Development
06/03/1992Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, and Rural Development
06/02/1992Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, and Rural Development
05/28/1992Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, and Rural Development.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
05/28/1992Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
05/21/1992Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/21/1992Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture05/21/1992 Referred to
06/25/1992 Markup by
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation, Credit, and Rural Development05/28/1992 Referred to
06/02/1992 Hearings by
06/03/1992 Markup by
06/03/1992 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5238. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (05/21/1992)

Revitalization of Health and Education in Rural America Act of 1992 - Amends the Food, Agriculture, Conservation, and Trade Act of 1990 to direct the Administrator of the Rural Electrification Administration to establish a program for providing grants to qualified consortia to assist them in obtaining access to modern interactive telecommunications systems through the public switched network.

Sets forth: (1) application requirements; (2) review and comment procedures (by a State agency); (3) criteria for selection of grantees (giving priority to applications demonstrating the greatest likelihood of successfully and efficiently carrying out specified activities, the participation of the local telephone exchange carrier in providing and operating the telecommunications transmission facilities required by a State plan for upgrading rural telecommunications infrastructure, and unconditional financial support from the local community, and ensuring (to the extent possible) that various regions of the United States benefit from the use of the grants); and (4) limits on the maximum grant amount and the period of disbursement of grants.

Specifies that grants under this Act may be used to support the costs of activities involving the sending and receiving of information to improve health care or educational services in rural areas.

Sets limitations with respect to: (1) the use of grant funds for the acquisition of interactive telecommunications equipment; (2) the use of such funds to employ consultants; and (3) the authorization of appropriations. Bars the use of funds under this Act to establish or operate a telecommunications network or telecommuncations service for hire.

Amends the Rural Electrification Act of 1936 (REA) to: (1) provide for a reduction in the interest rate on insured telephone loans for borrowers from States with plans for upgrading rural telecommunications infrastructure; and (2) eliminate a preference for rural telephone bank loans for borrowers located in such States.

Modifies the definition of "rural area" for purposes of telephone loans to mean specified areas not included within the boundaries of an area having a population in excess of 10,000 (currently, 1,500) inhabitants.

Expresses the sense of the Congress that persons eligible for telephone loans under the REA who are interested in upgrading telecommunications in rural areas should obtain financial assistance under such Act through a subsidiary in order to limit the assets subject to the lien requirements of such Act.

Directs the Administrator of the Rural Electrification Administration and the Governor of the Rural Telephone Bank to prescribe such regulations as necessary to carry out this Act.