Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK-1]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ-9]* 05/21/1992
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/09/1992
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 06/09/1992
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-15] 06/16/1992
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 06/16/1992
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 06/17/1992
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/29/1992
Rep. Sundquist, Don [R-TN-7] 06/29/1992
Rep. Grandy, Fred [R-IA-6] 06/29/1992
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/21/1992
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 07/21/1992
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-5] 07/21/1992
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/22/1992
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 07/29/1992
Rep. Bruce, Terry L. [D-IL-19] 07/30/1992
Rep. Lent, Norman F. [R-NY-4] 08/06/1992
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 08/06/1992
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 08/06/1992
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-22] 08/06/1992
Rep. Geren, Pete [D-TX-12] 08/06/1992
Rep. Laughlin, Greg [D-TX-14] 08/06/1992
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 08/06/1992
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 08/06/1992
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-31] 08/06/1992
Rep. Santorum, Rick [R-PA-18] 08/06/1992
Rep. Rowland, J. Roy [D-GA-8] 08/06/1992
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 08/11/1992
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 08/11/1992
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-21] 08/12/1992
Rep. Lewis, Thomas F. [R-FL-12] 08/12/1992
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 08/12/1992
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/09/1992
Rep. Hancock, Mel [R-MO-7] 09/09/1992
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 09/09/1992
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/09/1992
Rep. Franks, Gary A. [R-CT-5] 09/09/1992
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 09/09/1992
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 09/09/1992
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/09/1992
Rep. Rhodes, John J., III [R-AZ-1] 09/09/1992
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 09/09/1992
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-8] 09/18/1992
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-13] 09/18/1992
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-21] 09/18/1992
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 09/18/1992
Rep. Darden, George (Buddy) [D-GA-7] 09/18/1992
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 09/18/1992
Rep. Payne, Lewis F., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/18/1992
Rep. Ray, Richard B. [D-GA-3] 09/18/1992
Rep. Thomas, Lindsay [D-GA-1] 09/18/1992
Rep. Allard, Wayne [R-CO-4] 09/18/1992
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-34] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-45] 09/18/1992
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 09/18/1992
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/18/1992
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/18/1992
Rep. Lightfoot, Jim [R-IA-5] 09/18/1992
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/18/1992
Rep. Espy, Mike [D-MS-2] 09/18/1992
Rep. Bentley, Helen Delich [R-MD-2] 09/18/1992
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-24] 09/18/1992
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/18/1992
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/18/1992
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 09/18/1992
Rep. Nichols, Dick [R-KS-5] 09/18/1992
Rep. Sangmeister, George E. [D-IL-4] 09/22/1992
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 09/22/1992
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-43] 09/22/1992
Rep. Durbin, Richard [D-IL-20] 09/22/1992
Rep. Johnson, Tim [D-SD-At Large] 09/24/1992
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 09/25/1992
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-4] 09/25/1992
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/30/1992
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 09/30/1992
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-40] 09/30/1992
Rep. Zeliff, William H., Jr. [R-NH-1] 09/30/1992
Rep. Schulze, Richard T. [R-PA-5] 09/30/1992
Rep. Moody, Jim [D-WI-5] 10/03/1992
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 10/03/1992
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 10/05/1992