Committees: H.R.5258 — 102nd Congress (1991-1992)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means05/21/1992 Referred to
09/16/1992 Markup by
09/18/1992 Reported by H.Rept 102-880
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade05/28/1992 Referred to
08/10/1992 Hearings by
09/10/1992 Markup by
09/10/1992 Reported by
Senate Finance09/23/1992 Referred to
09/30/1992 Discharged from